U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clements
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 24, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 25, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • June 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 10, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 09, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 09, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 07, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 07, 2022: [Arrest]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 23, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.