U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vasquez-Cecila
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Waiver]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 15, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 15, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • June 14, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • June 06, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 01, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 31, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.