U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:05-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Simpson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Miscellaneous Filing]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Miscellaneous Filing]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 05, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 05, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 05, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 05, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 04, 2022: [Arrest]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Prob49 or 42A - Waiver of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.