U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Aragon-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 27, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 27, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • June 22, 2022: [Factual Basis]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 25, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.