U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Terry
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 18, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 06, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 06, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Factual Basis]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 19, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 19, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 18, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 18, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 18, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • July 05, 2022: [Arrest - Other District]
  • July 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.