U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • October 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 01, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 01, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 27, 2022: [Factual Basis]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • June 07, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 07, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 02, 2022: [Arrest]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.