U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sorroza Marcial
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 12, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • December 12, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 08, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • June 06, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Arraignment]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.