U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baumgarner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • November 23, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 23, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 14, 2022: [Factual Basis]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 27, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 01, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 24, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • May 24, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 19, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.