U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harrison
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • January 24, 2023: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • January 24, 2023: [Plea Hearing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 23, 2023: [Factual Basis]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 21, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 16, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • November 16, 2022: [Seal Document]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • June 01, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 01, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 26, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.