U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cook
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Service by Publication]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 01, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • July 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 19, 2022: [Waiver]
  • July 19, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 17, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • June 17, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 17, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 14, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 14, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 11, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • June 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • June 09, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 09, 2022: [Factual Basis]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 25, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 25, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 23, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 20, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 20, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.