U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez Guzman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 17, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 17, 2022: [Factual Basis]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
  • May 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.