U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: [Document]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Seal ]
  • December 06, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 20, 2022: [Seal ]
  • November 20, 2022: [Ex Parte Motion to Seal]
  • November 20, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 05, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Memorandum in Support]
  • August 31, 2022: [Seal ]
  • August 31, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 13, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extension of Time]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 07, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Text Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 18, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.