U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wooten
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 09, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • October 07, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 07, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 08, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 08, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Text Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.