U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00094-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boone
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 05, 2023: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 14, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • September 26, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 12, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • September 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Detention]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 07, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.