U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carroll
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • May 22, 2025: [Suppress ]
  • May 22, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [Seal ]
  • April 02, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sequester]
  • April 01, 2025: [Preserve ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Jenks Material]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Seal ]
  • March 21, 2025: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
January, 2025
  • January 12, 2025: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Extension of Time]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 18, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • August 18, 2022: [Status Report ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 11, 2022: [Letter]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Protective Order ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 03, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 26, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 25, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 25, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 25, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 24, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.