U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Batts
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Objection to PSI]
  • January 05, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 28, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 17, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • September 15, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • September 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.