U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Forgo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Letter]
  • January 04, 2023: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Inquiry of Counsel]
  • December 28, 2022: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
  • December 20, 2022: [Inquiry of Counsel]
  • December 06, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • December 06, 2022: [Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Service by Publication]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 04, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 04, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 04, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 18, 2022: [Factual Basis]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • June 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • June 15, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 14, 2022: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 13, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 13, 2022: [Arrest]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 23, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.