U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Felder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 06, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 30, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • November 30, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 30, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • November 22, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 14, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 07, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • July 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 25, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 25, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • May 25, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 23, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 20, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 20, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 19, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.