U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Letter]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 11, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Service by Publication]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 05, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • August 05, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 05, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 15, 2022: [Factual Basis]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Information Pursuant to Title 21]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 17, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.