U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brady
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 19, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • September 19, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • September 19, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • September 16, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • September 14, 2022: [Plea Hearing Held - Not Completed]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • September 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 12, 2022: [Factual Basis]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 12, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 01, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 01, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • May 24, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 23, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 20, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 19, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 18, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 18, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.