U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brittain
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 22, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • June 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 14, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 09, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 09, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 09, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 09, 2022: [Arrest]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 19, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 19, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.