U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morgan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 22, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • November 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 25, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • May 25, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • May 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 19, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.