U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bruen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • January 24, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • January 10, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 22, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 22, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 22, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • November 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • November 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Review Magistrate Judge Detention/Release Order]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • July 14, 2022: [Review Magistrate Judge Detention/Release Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 12, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • June 01, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 01, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 26, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 26, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 19, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.