U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00138-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Alasfar et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 24, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 19, 2023: [Indictment]
  • January 18, 2023: [Dismiss]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • December 20, 2022: [Travel]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 27, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 21, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 20, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • June 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2022: [Bond]
  • June 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 13, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 08, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • June 07, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 06, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2022: [Sealed Document]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 19, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • May 19, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.