U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00137-1
  • Case Name: USA v. May
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • January 05, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 31, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 31, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [Factual Basis]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 19, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • June 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • June 01, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 27, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 26, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 26, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 19, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 19, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.