U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00136-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mayhue
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue Other]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue Other]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re: Other]
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 23, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 23, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 23, 2022: [Extension of Time re: Other]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 17, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • June 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • May 31, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 31, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • May 30, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 25, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 25, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 24, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 19, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 19, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.