U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03170
  • Case Name: Harris v. Wake County Jail
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 14, 2022: [USCA Order]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • August 12, 2022: [Assembled Electronic Record on Appeal transmitted to 4CCA]
  • August 12, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 23, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 03, 2022: [Response to Order]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 19, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 19, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.