U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • December 07, 2022: [Transcript]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • October 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • October 03, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • July 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • July 05, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • July 05, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice of Related Case]
  • May 19, 2022: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.