U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crabtree, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Document]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to 23-SO-6]
  • October 04, 2024: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
  • October 04, 2024: [Withdraw as Attorney Regarding 23-SO-6]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Seal ]
  • January 17, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • January 13, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • November 08, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • September 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • August 24, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • August 24, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 24, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 20, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.