U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03171
  • Case Name: Miller v. Roberts
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Document]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 06, 2022: [Financial Disclosure Statement]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 10, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2022: [Document]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 19, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 09, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 17, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 15, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 13, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • June 10, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 10, 2022: [Document]
  • June 10, 2022: [Complaint]
  • June 07, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 07, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • June 07, 2022: [Complaint]
  • June 06, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order]
  • May 23, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 20, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.