U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-mj-01108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McKnight et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 06, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 01, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 27, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.