U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00146-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DRAUGHN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • May 13, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing/Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • May 13, 2025: [Preliminary Revocation and Detention Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Appointing Panel Attorney]
  • May 08, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Oral Motion]
  • May 07, 2025: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit-SEALED]
  • May 07, 2025: [Rule 32.1 Documents Received]
  • May 07, 2025: [Arrest - Other District ]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Case Referred to Judge]
  • December 21, 2022: [Case Reassigned]
  • December 15, 2022: [SEALED Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 15, 2022: [SEALED Statement of Reasons]
  • December 15, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Supplement Report]
  • December 15, 2022: [SEALED USPO PROB 12C - Offender Under Supervision]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.