U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03172
  • Case Name: Guarascio v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 08, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • July 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Rule 12 Letter]
  • June 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • June 20, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 17, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • May 25, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • May 25, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 23, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.