U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00242-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vergara Torres
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 26, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 25, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 25, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 25, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 23, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.