U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01486-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nguyen
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Docket Call]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 04, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 03, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 02, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 23, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.