U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01485-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jean
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • July 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Waiver-Other]
  • July 15, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 06, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 02, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 23, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.