U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01484-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • June 02, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 23, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.