U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01482-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barnes
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Consolidate Cases]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 29, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Document]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 21, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • May 23, 2022: [Violation Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.