U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03173
  • Case Name: Hytower v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 23, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • September 06, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 24, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • May 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 24, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • May 24, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 24, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 24, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 24, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.