U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01488-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pierce
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • July 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 18, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 15, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 14, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Warrant Issued ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Complaint ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.