U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01489-1
  • Case Name: USA v. James
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Docket Call]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 14, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2022: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 02, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Violation Notice]
  • May 24, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.