U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02092
  • Case Name: Sheikh v. Buffaloe
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • August 05, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 05, 2022: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • August 05, 2022: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • August 05, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • August 05, 2022: [Response to Habeas Petition]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 29, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2254]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
  • June 23, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 23, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 25, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 25, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.