U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02091
  • Case Name: Corbett v. Locklear
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 16, 2022: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • November 16, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 16, 2022: [Response]
  • November 04, 2022: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Entry of Default]
  • October 25, 2022: [Roseboro Letter - Right to Respond]
  • October 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Support]
  • October 25, 2022: [Appendix to the Statement of Facts]
  • October 25, 2022: [Statement of Material Facts]
  • October 25, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 25, 2022: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 22, 2022: [Motion Referred to Clerk]
  • September 22, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 16, 2022: [Letter to Respond Issued HC 2254]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order Directing Clerk to Continue Management of case]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • May 25, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • May 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 25, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.