U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03177
  • Case Name: Norman v. Nash Correctional Institution et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Response to Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 13, 2022: [Case Submitted]
  • June 13, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.