U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-mj-01095-8
  • Case Name: USA v. LNU
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • June 02, 2022: [Commitment to Another District]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • June 02, 2022: [Removal Hearing]
  • June 02, 2022: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 02, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 27, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 27, 2022: [Detention]
  • May 27, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • May 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2022: [Arrest - Rule 5]
  • May 25, 2022: [Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.