U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-ct-03176
  • Case Name: Miller v. Roberts
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • June 06, 2022: [Letter]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Trust Fund Information Requested]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 25, 2022: [Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees]
  • May 25, 2022: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement]
  • May 25, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.