U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-01490-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Batson
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Plea and Sentence ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
  • December 15, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • December 14, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2022: [Release Status Report]
  • August 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice Regarding US Passport]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 13, 2022: [Text Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Summons Issued ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Summons Requested]
  • May 25, 2022: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • May 25, 2022: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.