U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00246-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perales
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 01, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • May 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • May 28, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 25, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 25, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 25, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.