U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02094
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Harris
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Suggestion of Death]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order]
  • June 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 26, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 26, 2022: [Stay]
  • May 26, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 26, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 26, 2022: [Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.