U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-hc-02093
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Carrington, Jr.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 06, 2025: [Letter]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Expedite]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Remark]
  • March 28, 2025: [Annual Forensic Update]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice-other]
  • January 04, 2023: [Text Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Expert]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 17, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Appoint Expert]
  • July 28, 2022: [Discovery]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • May 26, 2022: [Stay]
  • May 26, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • May 26, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Forensic Report]
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 26, 2022: [Certificate of Mental Disease or Defect and Dangerousness]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.